+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to Governor
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ uncircled
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
January 27, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
January 26, 2022: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
January 26, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2022: Senate/ uncircled
January 25, 2022: Senate/ circled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor