+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (66)
On March 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
- House Conference Committee - Final Passage
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
- Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House/ refused to recede from House amendment
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information
- Senate/ to House
- Bill Substituted by Conference Committee from # 3 to # 4
- Conference Committee Report
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment failed # 2 (sections 1,2,3)
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ floor amendment # 2 sections 4-5
- House/ floor amendment # 3
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (4)
House Floor Amendment 2
Pass/mod
House Floor Amendment 3
Passed
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (19)
March 6, 2020: House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
March 6, 2020: Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
March 6, 2020: Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2020: House Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 6
March 5, 2020: Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments
March 5, 2020: House/ refused to recede from House amendment
March 4, 2020: House/ floor amendment failed # 2 (sections 1,2,3)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2020: House/ floor amendment # 2 sections 4-5
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2020: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2020: House/ floor amendment # 3
February 20, 2020: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2020: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2020: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2020: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 11, 2020: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2020: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2020: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
January 31, 2020: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2020: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor