+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ lift bill from committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 10, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor