+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2016: Senate/ circled
February 17, 2016: Senate/ motion to reconsider
February 16, 2016: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 15
February 16, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
January 29, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor