+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules Comm due to fiscal impact
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
February 17, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 15, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 14, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor