+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Senate/ read 2nd (Suspension)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On December 15, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 9, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
January 27, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 6
January 20, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 19, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor