+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substitute adoption failed from # 4 to # 6
- House/ substitute adoption failed from # 4 to # 5
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 4
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
February 10, 2022: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 12
February 9, 2022: House/ substitute adoption failed from # 4 to # 5
February 9, 2022: House/ substitute adoption failed from # 4 to # 6
February 4, 2022: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 4
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
February 4, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
January 28, 2022: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
January 28, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 26, 2022: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor