+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2012: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 15
March 5, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
February 22, 2012: Senate/ circled
February 21, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2012: Senate/ substituted
February 14, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor