+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 18, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 16, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 15, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 2, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor