+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 3
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ lifted from calendar sent to standing comm
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2016: House/ floor amendment # 3
March 9, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 9, 2016: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
March 7, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 18
- Absent: 11
February 25, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor