+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 21, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On February 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substitute
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 16, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 14, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 2, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor