+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ failed
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ returned to Rules Committee
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2007: House/ failed
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 6
February 20, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor