+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ floor amendment
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
March 13, 2014: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
March 12, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 5
February 28, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 4
February 27, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
February 26, 2014: Senate/ circled
February 26, 2014: Senate/ floor amendment
February 14, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor