+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Held
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 9, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 7
March 1, 2006: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
January 24, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 18, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Sen. Buttars, D. C.
Type:
Primary Sponsor