+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 7
February 22, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 18, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 2, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor