+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 4, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 2, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 4
January 19, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor