+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ to Senate
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (5)
House Amendment # 5
Passed
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
House Amendment # 3
Committee Amendments Prepared
House Amendment # 4
Committee Amendments Prepared
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2010: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 24, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 5
February 22, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 6
February 10, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
February 8, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Sen. Adams, J. S.
Type:
Primary Sponsor