+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (7)
February 8, 2021: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 4, 2021: House/ motion to reconsider
February 4, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 4, 2021: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor