+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ lift bill from committee
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 26, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 3, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 25, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
February 5, 2008: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 4, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 25, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor