+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 12, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 4, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor