+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Senate/ to House
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 13, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2007: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 29
February 14, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 11
February 8, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
January 30, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
January 29, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 18, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor