+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ failed
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment failed
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 14, 2013: House/ failed
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 8
March 5, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment failed
March 5, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
February 26, 2013: Senate/ circled
February 14, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor