+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
February 25, 2015: House/ circled
February 25, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 25, 2015: House/ uncircled
February 23, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2015: Senate/ uncircled
February 11, 2015: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 11, 2015: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2015: Senate/ circled
February 9, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 28, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor