+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 3
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2016: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 17, 2016: House/ floor amendment # 3
February 17, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
February 3, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
January 26, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor