+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2004: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 27, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 24, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 10, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor