+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Absent: 13
March 2, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
March 1, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2010: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor