+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 3
February 14, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor