+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
March 10, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
March 6, 2014: Senate/ motion to reconsider
March 6, 2014: Senate/ circled
March 5, 2014: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 9
February 24, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 2
February 4, 2014: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor