+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 11, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 7
February 3, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor