+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ lifted from Rules Comm
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Lifted from Table
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Lifted from Table
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Tabled
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 13, 2009: Senate Comm - Tabled
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor