+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ lift bill from committee
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 13, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 28, 2007: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 29
January 30, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 29, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor