+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ to Senate
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules Comm due to fiscal impact
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ uncircled
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 3, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 3, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
January 27, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 19, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor