+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ motion to reconsider passed
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ filed
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2010: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2010: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor