+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ substituted by Rules
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 11, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 6, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor