+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Line Item Veto
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ amended
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ refuses to concur in House amend
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ refused to recede from amendments
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate Conference Comm Rpt Adopted
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ to Senate
- House Conference Comm Rpt Adopted
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Comm Appointed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House Conference Comm Appointed
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Amendments (19)
House Amendment # 27
Failed
House Amendment # 25
Failed
Senate Amendment # 17
Failed
Senate Amendment # 11
Failed
Senate Amendment # 15
Failed
Senate Amendment # 9
Failed
Senate Amendment # 10
Failed
Senate Amendment # 12
Failed
House Amendment # 20
Passed
Senate Amendment # 8
Failed
House Amendment # 24
Passed
House Amendment # 19
Passed
House Amendment # 21
Passed
House Amendment # 5
Prepared
House Amendment # 23
Prepared
House Amendment # 7
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 3
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
House Amendment # 4
Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2006: House Conference Comm Rpt Adopted
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 10
March 1, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2006: Senate Conference Comm Rpt Adopted
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor