+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ failed
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 2, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 6, 2013: House/ failed
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 50
- Absent: 9
March 1, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
February 27, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
February 26, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
February 26, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
February 25, 2013: Senate/ circled
February 11, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor