+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 2
Passed
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2010: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 22, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 5, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor