+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd suspended
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ substituted
- House/ uncircled
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
House Amendment # 2
Prepared
+ − Votes (12)
March 13, 2014: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2014: House/ substituted
March 5, 2014: House/ uncircled
March 5, 2014: House/ circled
February 24, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
February 18, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 18, 2014: Senate/ substituted
February 11, 2014: Senate/ circled
February 10, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 4, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor