+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Senate/ to House
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ motion to reconsider/ passed
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ place back on 3rd Reading Cal
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- OLRGC returned to Senate
- Senate/ recalled by Senate
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ uncircled
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 21, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 27, 2006: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 3, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 3
January 30, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 18, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor