+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ to Senate
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 3, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 2, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 24, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor