+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On December 15, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 21, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 28, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor