+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ circled
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2015: Senate/ circled
March 5, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor