+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ substituted
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2012: House/ circled
March 8, 2012: House/ floor amendment
March 8, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 6
March 8, 2012: House/ substituted
March 8, 2012: House/ uncircled
March 8, 2012: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 29
February 29, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor