+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment failed # 5
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 4
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2017: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2017: Senate/ floor amendment failed # 5
February 10, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
January 25, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 0
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 4
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor