+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2015: Senate/ circled
March 9, 2015: Senate/ strike enacting clause
March 9, 2015: Senate/ uncircled
March 5, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor