+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
February 29, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor