+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (64)
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House Conference Committee Appointed
- House/ refused to recede from House amendment
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ substituted
- House/ 3rd reading
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House Conference Committee - Final Passage
- House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
- House/ to Senate
- House Conference Committee Appointed
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (12)
March 8, 2012: Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments
March 8, 2012: House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
March 8, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2012: House/ refused to recede from House amendment
March 8, 2012: House/ substituted
March 8, 2012: Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
March 8, 2012: Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
March 8, 2012: House Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
March 6, 2012: Senate/ floor amendment
March 5, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 29, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor