+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Rules Committee
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Committee
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On December 17, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 11, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor