+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
February 19, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor