+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (61)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House Conference Committee Appointed
- House/ refused to recede from House amendment
- House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Conference Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Conference Committee - Final Passage
- House/ received from Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
- Senate/ received from House
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ floor amendment failed
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment failed
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (14)
March 14, 2013: House Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 4
March 14, 2013: House/ refused to recede from House amendment
March 14, 2013: Senate/ circled
March 14, 2013: Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 14, 2013: Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
March 14, 2013: Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments
March 14, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
March 14, 2013: House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
March 13, 2013: House/ floor amendment
March 13, 2013: House/ floor amendment failed
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 50
- Absent: 2
March 13, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 3
March 11, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 11, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
March 6, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Sen. Adams, J. S.
Type:
Primary Sponsor